## Engage NY Eureka Math Grade 5 Module 2 Lesson 1 Answer Key

### Eureka Mathematics Grade 5 Module 2 Lesson 1 Problem Game Answer Key

Question 1.

Fill in the blanks using your knowledge of place value units and basic facts.

a. 23 × 20

Think: 23 ones × 2 tens = _____46_____ tens

23 × 20 = ____460______

Respondedor:

23 x 20 = 460.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

23 ones x 2 tens = 46 tens.

23 x 20 = 460.

b. 230 × 20

Think: 23 tens × 2 tens = ____46 tens______

230 × 20 = ____4600______

Respondedor:

230x20 = 4600.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

23 tens x 2 tens = 46 tens.

230x20 = 4600.

C. 41 × 4

41 units × 4 units = 164 ___units_______

41 × 4 = ____164______

Respondedor:

41 x 4 = 164.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

41 units x 4 units = 164 units.

41 x 4 = 164.

d. 410 × 400

41 tens × 4 hundreds = 164 ___tens_______

410 × 400 = _____161000_____

Respondedor:

410x400 = 16100.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

41 tens x 4 hundreds = 164 tens.

410x400 = 16100.

mi. 3.310 × 300

___3310___ tens × ___3___ hundreds = 993 ________

3.310 × 300 = __993________

Respondedor:

3310x300 = 993.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

3310 tens x 3 tens = 993 tens.

3310x300 = 993.

F. 500 × 600

___5___ hundreds × __6___ hundreds = 30 _____

500 × 600 = ____3000______

Respondedor:

500 x 6000 = 3000.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

5 hundreds x 6 hundreds = 30 hundreds.

500x600 = 3000.

Question 2.

Determine if these equations are true or false. Defend your answer using your knowledge of place value and the commutative, associative, and/or distributive properties.

El. 6 tens = 2 tens × 3 tens

b. 44 × 20 × 10 = 440 × 2

w. 86 ones × 90 hundreds = 86 ones × 900 tens

d. 64 × 8 × 100 = 640 × 8 × 10

mi. 57 × 2 × 10 × 10 × 10 = 570 × 2 × 10

Respondedor:

The real.

b. FALSE.

w. TRUE.

d. TRUE.

It's false.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

El. 6 tens = 2 tens × 3 tens

6 you have = 6 you have.

b. 44 × 20 × 10 = 440 × 2

44x10 = 440x20 = 880.

w. 86 ones × 90 hundreds = 86 ones × 900 tens

86x900 = 86x900.

d. 64 × 8 × 100 = 640 × 8 × 10

64x10 = 640x8 .

640x8x10.

mi. 57 × 2 × 10 × 10 × 10 = 570 × 2 × 10

57x20x10x10 = 570x20.

570x20x10 = 640.

Question 3.

Find the products. Show your thinking. The first line gives some ideas to show your thinking.

Respondedor:

450x300 = 135000.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

45 x 3 = 45 x 30. = 12 x 10 = 120.

450 x 30 = (45 x 10) (3 x 10) = 45 x 3 x 10 x 10 = 450 x 30 = 13500.

Respondedor:

400 x 5000 = 20.000.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

40x5 = 40x50. = 40x500 = 2000.

400 x 5000 = (4 x 10) (5 x 100) = 20 x 10 x 100 = 200 x 100 = 20.000.

Question 4.

Ripley told her mother that multiplying whole numbers by multiples of 10 was easy because all she had to do was count zeros in the factors and put them in the product. She used these two examples to explain her strategy.

Ripley's mother said her strategy won't always work. Why not? Set an example.

Respondedor:

80x100 = 8000.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

80x100 = 8000.

8x1000 = 8000.

Question 5.

The Canadian side of Niagara Falls has a flow rate of 600,000 gallons per second. How many gallons of water flow over the falls in 1 minute?

Respondedor:

Gallons of water flow over the falls in 1 minute = 3,60,00,000.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

The Canadian side of Niagara Falls has a flow rate of 600,000 gallons per second.

1 minute = 60 seconds.

600.000x60.

3,60,00,000.

Question 6.

Tickets for a baseball game are $20 for adults and $15 for students. A school buys tickets for 45 adults and 600 students. How much money will the school spend on tickets?

Respondedor:

The money the school spends on tickets = $9,900.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

Tickets for a baseball game are $20 for adults and $15 for students.

A school buys tickets for 45 adults and 600 students.

45 x $ 20 + 600 x $ 15.

900 + 9000.

9900.

### Eureka Mathematics Grade 5 Module 2 Lesson 1 Exit Ticket Answer Key

Question 1.

Find the products.

a. 1.900 × 20

Respondedor:

1900x20 = 38.000.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

1900x20.

38000.

b. 6.000 × 50

Respondedor:

6000x50 = 30000.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

6000x50

30000.

C. 250 × 300

Respondedor:

250x300 = 75000.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

250x300.

75000.

Question 2.

Explain how knowing 50 × 4 = 200 helps you find 500 × 400.

Respondedor:

50 x 4 = 200.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

50x4.

200.

### Eureka Mathematics Grade 5 Module 2 Lesson 1 Homework Answers Homework

Question 1.

Fill in the blanks using your knowledge of place value units and basic facts.

a. 43 × 30

Think: 43 ones × 3 tens = _____129_____ tens

43 × 30 = ___1290_______

Respondedor:

43 x 30 = 1290.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

43 ones x 3 tens = 129 tens.

43 x 30 = 1290.

b. 430 × 30

Think: 43 tens × 3 tens = ____129______ hundreds

430 × 30 = ____1290______

Respondedor:

430x30 = 1290.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

43 tens x 3 tens = 129 hundreds.

430x30 = 1290.

C. 830 × 20

Think: 83 tens × 2 tens = 166 ____tens______

830 × 20 = ____16600______

Respondedor:

830x20 = 16600.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

83 tens x 2 tens = 166 tens.

830x20 = 1660.

d. 4.400 × 400

____440____ hundreds × _____40_____ hundreds = 176 ____ hundreds______

4.400 × 400 = _____176000_____

Respondedor:

4400x400 = 176000.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

440 hundreds x 40 hundreds = 176 hundreds.

4400x400 = 176000.

mi. 80 × 5.000

____8______ tens × ____5______ thousand = 40 _____ thousand_____

80 × 5.000 = ____40000______

Respondedor:

80x5000 = 40000.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

8 tens x 5 thousand = 40 thousand.

80x5000 = 40000.

Question 2.

Determine if these equations are true or false. Defend your answer using your knowledge of place value and the commutative, associative, and/or distributive properties.

El. 35 hundreds = 5 tens × 7 tens

Respondedor:

35 hundreds = 5 tens x 7 tens.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

5 tens x 7 tens = 35 hundreds.

5 x 7 = 35.

b. 770 × 6 = 77 × 6 × 100

Respondedor:

770 x 6 = 77 x 6 x 100.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

770 x 6 = 77 x 100 x 6.

4620 = 46200.

w. 50 tens × 4 hundreds = 40 tens × 5 hundreds

Respondedor:

50 tens x 4 hundreds = 40 tens x 5 hundreds.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

50 tens x 4 hundreds = 40 tens x 5 hundreds.

200 = 200.

d. 24 × 10 × 90 = 90 × 2.400

Respondedor:

24x10x90 = 90x2400.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

24x10x90 = 90x2400.

240x90 = 21600.

90x2400 = 216000.

Question 3.

Find the products. Show your thinking. The first line gives some ideas to show your thinking.

Respondedor:

b. 80x5 = 80x50 = 40x10 = 400.

800 x 500 = (8 x 100) x (5 x 100) = (8 x 5) x 1000 = 40000.

8000 x 50 = (8 x 5) x (100 x 1000) = 400000.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

80x5 = 80x50 = 40x10 = 400.

800 x 500 = (8 x 100) x (5 x 100) = (8 x 5) x 1000 = 40000.

8000 x 50 = (8 x 5) x (100 x 1000) = 400000.

Respondedor:

d. 673 x 3 = 6730 x 30 = 2019 x 100 = 20190.

6730 x 300 = (673 x 100) x (3 x 100) = (673 x 3) x 1000 = 201900.

63700 x 3000 = (6730 x 1000) x (637 x 10000) = 2019000.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

673 x 3 = 6730 x 30 = 2019 x 100 = 20190.

6730 x 300 = (673 x 100) x (3 x 100) = (673 x 3) x 1000 = 201900.

63700 x 3000 = (6730 x 1000) x (637 x 10000) = 2019000.

Question 4.

A concrete diving board is 20 square inches. What is the area of 30 of these stones?

Respondedor:

The area of 30 of these stones = 600 square inches.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

A concrete diving board is 20 square inches.

20 x 30 = 600.

Question 5.

A number is 42,300 when multiplied by 10. Find the product of that number times 500.

Respondedor:

4230x10 = 42300.

Explanation:

In the previous question,

Given the,

A number is 42,300 when multiplied by 10.

500 = 50x10.

50 x 10 = 500.